Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/24/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/24/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/24/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 01/24/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/24/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/04/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/04/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/13/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/14/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/04/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/04/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/05/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/11/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/11/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/11/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/11/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/11/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/13/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/13/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/18/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/18/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/15/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/15/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/15/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/15/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/15/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/24/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/26/2002