Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/15/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/15/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/15/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/15/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/15/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/15/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 11/15/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/15/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/05/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/12/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/06/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/12/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/20/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/11/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/17/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/18/2002