Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/06/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/06/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/06/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/06/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/06/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/06/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/07/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/07/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/07/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/07/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/07/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/07/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/07/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/07/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/07/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/13/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 02/13/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/27/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/27/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/27/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/13/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/13/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/20/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/24/2001