Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 10/12/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 10/12/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 10/12/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/16/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/07/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/14/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/14/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/28/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/19/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/19/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/10/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/10/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/17/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/07/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/04/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/04/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/04/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/19/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/19/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/15/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/15/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/11/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/11/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/11/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/25/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/26/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/08/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/09/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/24/2002