Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/05/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/05/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/05/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/31/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/31/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/31/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/31/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/16/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/27/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/27/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/27/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/27/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/19/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 12/19/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/19/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/19/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/19/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/19/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/20/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/20/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/20/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/20/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 12/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 12/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 12/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/05/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/05/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/05/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/26/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/06/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/20/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/20/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/16/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/16/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/18/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/24/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/24/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/12/2002