Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/04/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/27/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/27/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/27/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/05/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/05/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/05/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/17/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/17/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/18/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/23/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/07/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/09/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/09/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/14/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/14/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/20/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/05/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/11/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/11/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/12/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/12/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/12/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/20/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/20/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/04/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/12/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/18/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/08/2002