Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/20/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/11/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/11/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/27/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/27/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/28/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/29/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/18/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 12/18/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/18/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 01/23/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/12/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/27/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/27/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/05/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/20/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/18/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/20/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/04/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/05/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/08/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/28/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2002