Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/07/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/07/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/07/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/13/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/13/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/20/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/03/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/03/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/03/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/05/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/23/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/23/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/09/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/14/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/21/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/27/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/08/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/08/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/22/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/16/2002