Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/26/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/28/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/01/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/01/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/01/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/01/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/01/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/01/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/01/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/07/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/07/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/07/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/07/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/07/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/07/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/07/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/07/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/07/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/08/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/19/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/19/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/19/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/19/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/19/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/19/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/19/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/19/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/19/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/19/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/19/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/21/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/21/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/22/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/22/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/27/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/27/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/27/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/27/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/27/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/03/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/24/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/05/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/19/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/20/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002