Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/09/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/10/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/10/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/10/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/11/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/11/2001