Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/12/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 12/12/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/12/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 12/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/20/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/20/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/06/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/27/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/14/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/14/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/16/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/16/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/25/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/06/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/17/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/04/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/04/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/10/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 11/13/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/13/2002