Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/31/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/10/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/10/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/10/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/20/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/20/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/05/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/05/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/05/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/12/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/12/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/12/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/29/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/12/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/12/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/26/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/18/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/19/2002