Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/03/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/06/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/07/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/07/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/08/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/13/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/14/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/15/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/26/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 03/26/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/04/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/26/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/03/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/09/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/15/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/25/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/30/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/01/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/12/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/19/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/16/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/12/2002