Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/11/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 07/12/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/12/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/12/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 07/18/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/18/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/18/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/18/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/27/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/27/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/27/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/27/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/27/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/25/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/09/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/07/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/28/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/18/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/18/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/01/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/03/2002