Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/11/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/07/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/29/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/23/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/24/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/29/2002