Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/07/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/20/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/20/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/10/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/10/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/12/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/12/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/25/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/09/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/09/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/09/2002