Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/27/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 07/27/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/27/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/27/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/02/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/05/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/10/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/10/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/16/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 12/18/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 12/18/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 12/18/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/29/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 01/29/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/14/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/14/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/05/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/05/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/07/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/07/2002