Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 06/21/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/21/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/26/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/26/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/26/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/23/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/23/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/23/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/23/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/23/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/23/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/30/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/30/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/30/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/30/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/30/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/06/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/05/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/05/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/05/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/05/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/16/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/16/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/08/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew