Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/28/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/23/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/23/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/23/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/23/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/23/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 08/02/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/05/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/05/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/05/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/05/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/24/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/24/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/24/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/24/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/05/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/05/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/01/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/06/2002