Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/27/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/28/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/29/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/27/2002