Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/25/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 08/01/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/28/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew