Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/20/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/21/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/21/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/28/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/28/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/17/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/18/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/18/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/24/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/03/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/17/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 11/28/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/14/2002