Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/13/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/13/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 06/13/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/14/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/19/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/20/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/21/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/21/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/21/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/21/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/25/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/25/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/25/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/16/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 08/01/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew