Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/12/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/11/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/17/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/05/2002