Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/14/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/14/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/14/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/10/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/23/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/23/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 08/02/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/02/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 12/18/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/23/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/23/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/13/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 02/13/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/13/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/13/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/13/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/13/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/12/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/14/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/12/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/12/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/12/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/12/2002