Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/07/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/07/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/07/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/27/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/27/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/28/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/28/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/28/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/28/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 12/20/2001