Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/26/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/26/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/26/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/20/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/10/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/01/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/12/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/10/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/10/2002