Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/21/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/06/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/29/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/08/2002