Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/21/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/12/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/12/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/12/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/12/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/12/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/12/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/24/2002