Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/08/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/08/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/08/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/08/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/08/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/08/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/08/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/21/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/21/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/12/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/12/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/12/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/24/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/02/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/02/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/04/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/04/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/12/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/12/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/12/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/12/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/12/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/12/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/12/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/12/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/17/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/17/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/17/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/06/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/06/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/06/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 12/13/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/29/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/13/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/07/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/23/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/21/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/17/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/17/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/17/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/17/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/17/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/08/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/08/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/10/2002