Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/17/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/21/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/21/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/21/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/22/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/23/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/12/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/12/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/20/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/17/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/17/2002