Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/12/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/12/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/12/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/12/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/14/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/14/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/14/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/28/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/05/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/08/2001