Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/30/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/30/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 01/30/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/30/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/30/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/30/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/30/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/30/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/30/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/13/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/13/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/06/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/03/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/24/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/02/2002