Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/15/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/21/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/21/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/23/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/25/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/25/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/07/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/13/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/14/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/21/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/25/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/25/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/23/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/24/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/24/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/09/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/12/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/25/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/01/2002