Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/03/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/03/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/03/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/03/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/03/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/03/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/03/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/10/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/10/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/10/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/17/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/17/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/17/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/17/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/21/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/21/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/21/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/24/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/24/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/07/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/27/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/20/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/17/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/18/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/25/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/25/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/25/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/25/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/02/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/02/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/07/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/01/2002