Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/01/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/01/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/03/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/03/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/14/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/14/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/14/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/15/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/15/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/23/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/13/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/13/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/10/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2001