Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/24/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/24/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/24/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/24/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/25/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/02/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/02/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/02/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/02/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/02/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/02/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/02/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/08/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/08/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/15/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/16/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/06/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/06/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/08/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/08/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/12/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/12/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/14/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/18/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/18/2001