Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/25/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/25/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/02/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/02/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/22/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/16/2002