Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/03/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/03/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/21/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/21/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/14/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/21/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/27/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/27/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/08/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/08/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/08/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/12/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/14/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/17/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/23/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/07/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/24/2002