Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/01/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/10/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/10/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/23/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/11/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/11/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/13/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/05/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/05/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/05/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/12/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/12/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/12/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/26/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/26/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/04/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/04/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/04/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/04/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/04/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/18/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/18/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/18/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/18/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/20/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/24/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/08/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/16/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/22/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/17/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/25/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/12/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/05/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/05/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/05/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/05/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/05/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/05/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/05/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/11/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/19/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/19/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/26/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/03/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/03/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/09/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/17/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/17/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/17/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/07/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/07/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/14/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/14/2002