Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/26/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/26/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/02/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/22/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/17/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/20/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/20/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/20/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/16/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/2001