Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/16/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/23/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/23/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/23/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/23/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/23/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/21/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/23/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/23/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/20/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/20/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/20/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/20/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/20/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/20/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/20/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/20/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 10/02/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/02/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/28/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/28/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/13/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/13/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 12/13/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/13/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 12/20/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/20/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/05/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/05/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/05/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/05/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/09/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/09/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/09/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/19/2002