Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/03/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/01/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/01/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/17/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/23/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/23/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/11/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/30/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/30/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/07/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/07/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/07/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/07/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/20/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/20/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/20/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/20/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/20/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/20/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/05/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/24/2002