Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/27/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/27/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/04/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/04/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/06/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/26/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/26/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/26/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/26/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/26/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/26/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/26/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/26/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/26/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/26/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/26/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/26/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/26/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/26/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/26/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/26/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/28/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/09/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/09/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/09/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/09/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/05/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/14/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/14/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/14/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/23/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/23/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/15/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/10/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/10/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/10/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/13/2002