Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/20/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/22/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/28/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/09/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/09/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/15/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/07/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/11/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/12/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/20/2002