Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/20/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/01/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/01/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/08/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/08/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/08/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/08/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/13/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/13/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/13/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/13/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/19/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/28/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/28/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/28/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/10/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/10/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/10/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/11/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/11/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 01/29/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/29/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/12/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/14/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/05/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/05/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/05/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/05/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/05/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/07/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/14/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/14/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/21/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/06/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/15/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/10/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew