Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/19/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/19/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/19/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/20/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/27/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/21/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/24/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/26/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/17/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/27/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/12/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/13/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/20/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/14/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/08/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/26/2002