Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/28/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/28/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/28/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/28/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/01/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/01/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/24/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/24/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/24/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/21/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/21/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/21/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/21/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/21/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/19/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/09/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/09/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/09/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/20/2002