Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/20/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/21/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/14/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/12/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/13/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/12/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/18/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/10/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/10/2002