Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/06/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 02/06/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/06/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/06/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/06/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/27/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/07/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/07/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/07/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/13/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/13/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/04/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/12/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/20/2001